Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00415
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 1:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Cirrus Logic, Inc.
Defendant
Lion Semiconductor Inc.
Plaintiff
pSemi Corp.
Represented By
Michael A. Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 12:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/03 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Cirrus Logic, Inc. on 4/3/2025; Lion Semiconductor Inc. on 4/3/2025.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 04/03 9:00 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. for pSemi Corp. filed by pSemi Corp. (mrr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 04/03 8:57 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 12,113,438; 12,143,010; 12,212,232. (mrr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 04/03 8:55 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Cirrus Logic, Inc., Lion Semiconductor Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4652707) - filed by pSemi Corp.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet