New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:25-cv-02301
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
PARSONS INSPECTION & MAINTENANCE CORPORATION
Represented By
NOEL A. LESICA
Ogletree Deakins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SANDRA GINOCCHIO


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 3:47 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties' request that the motion to dismiss is adjourned two cycles to 6/16/2025. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/1/2025. (sm) Modified on 5/1/2025 (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 10:48 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/2/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 3:48 PM
Reset Deadlines as to7 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/16/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 4:12 PM
Reset Deadlines as to7 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/2/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. CLERK'S NOTE: Motion to Remand was reset in error. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 4:13 PM
Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 6/16/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Wed 04/30 12:09 PM
Letter re1 Notice of Removal,. (NOBLE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Remand Wed 04/30 12:06 PM
First MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs.(NOBLE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 11:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 12:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP OF NEW YORK, INC..(LESICA, NOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Certification of Noel A. Lesica,
Att: 3 Certification of Melissa Weisman,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 04/08 9:24 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Parsons Inspection & Maintenance Corporation. Attorney NOEL A. LESICA for PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP OF NEW YORK, INC. added. (LESICA, NOEL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/08 4:11 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP OF NEW YORK, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/24/2025. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER W. RAAP on behalf of PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP OF NEW YORK, INC. (RAAP, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 2:56 PM
Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 7:12 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by PARSONS INSPECTION & MAINTENANCE CORPORATION. (LESICA, NOEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 04/03 7:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARSONS INSPECTION & MAINTENANCE CORPORATION identifying Parsons Inspection & Maintenance Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LESICA, NOEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/03 7:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PARSONS INSPECTION & MAINTENANCE CORPORATION from Middlesex County Superior Court, case number MID-L-1253-25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16144849), filed by PARSONS INSPECTION & MAINTENANCE CORPORATION.(LESICA, NOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service