Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 2:25-cv-00427
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Case in other court:14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, 25-00642
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 10:03 PM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By
Lindsay Graham Faulkner
Wanek Kirsch Davies
contact info
Peter J Wanek
Wanek Kirsch Davies
contact info
Plaintiff
Phyllis Thibodeaux
Represented By
Richard E Wilson
Cox Cox Et Al
contact info
Jackson Thomas Ritchie
Cox Cox Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Ulysses Gene Thibodeaux
Represented By
Richard E Wilson
Cox Cox Et Al
contact info
Jackson Thomas Ritchie
Cox Cox Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 misc Response to Removal Order Thu 04/17 12:32 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co .(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- State Court Record
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 2:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 order Removal Order Fri 04/04 11:17 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/4/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 10:14 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Faulkner, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 8:32 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ulysses Gene Thibodeaux, Phyllis Thibodeaux. (aty,Ritchie, Jackson) Modified on 4/4/2025 (Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 4:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Corporate Parent - State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) Modified to add corporate parent on 4/4/2025 (Bunting, M).
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Thu 04/03 2:48 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/3/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Thu 04/03 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Richard E Wilson, Lindsay Graham Faulkner on behalf of Ulysses Gene, Phyllis Thibodeaux, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Thu 04/03 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Lindsay Graham Faulkner on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2025-642 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6233970) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Attorney Lindsay Graham Faulkner added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft))(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs Petition for Breach of Contract, Penalties, and Attorneys Fees Pursuant to LA. R.S. § 22:1892,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Notice of Service of Process,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Estimate of Damages by Alsure Services,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Louisiana Department of Insurance Listing for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.,
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Thu 04/03 2:05 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 4/9/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
transfer Divisional Transfer Thu 04/03 2:31 PM
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:25-cv-427 from Alexandria Division to Lake Charles Division. New Case Number 2:25-cv-0427. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/03 2:32 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]