California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-02883
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 12:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Kerrie Dolan
Defendant
Steven Richard Gittleman
Defendant
Norberto Martinez
Defendant
Victor Rene Martinez
Plaintiff
Douglas Kruschen
an individual P O Box 465
Agoura Hills, CA 91376


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
28 28 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/05 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc., Kerrie Dolan, Steven Richard Gittleman, Norberto Martinez, Victor Rene Martinez, (Attorney Bronte Mehdian added to party Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bronte Mehdian added to party Kerrie Dolan(pty:dft), Attorney Bronte Mehdian added to party Steven Richard Gittleman(pty:dft), Attorney Bronte Mehdian added to party Norberto Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Bronte Mehdian added to party Victor Rene Martinez(pty:dft))(Mehdian, Bronte)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 05/05 11:28 AM
DECLARATION of Lonnie D. Giamela In Support of Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause23 filed by Defendants Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc., Kerrie Dolan, Steven Richard Gittleman, Norberto Martinez, Victor Rene Martinez.(Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- April 29 email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- April 30 email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- 5.1 Email to Plaintiff
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 05/05 11:25 AM
DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause23 filed by Defendants Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc., Kerrie Dolan, Steven Richard Gittleman, Norberto Martinez, Victor Rene Martinez. (Attorney Lonnie D Giamela added to party Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lonnie D Giamela added to party Kerrie Dolan(pty:dft), Attorney Lonnie D Giamela added to party Steven Richard Gittleman(pty:dft), Attorney Lonnie D Giamela added to party Norberto Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Lonnie D Giamela added to party Victor Rene Martinez(pty:dft))(Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 05/02 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Proposed Order - TRO Application23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/02 10:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO DOCUMENTS filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause23 served on 4/30/2025. (bm)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Show Cause Fri 05/02 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS KRUSCHEN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR TRO; [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen. (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 1:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint,20 as to defendant Victor Rene Martinez. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 1:58 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint,20 as to defendant Steven Richard Gittleman. (lc)
Related: [-]
20 20 othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 1:56 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Norberto Martinez, Victor Rene Martinez, Steven Richard Gittleman, Kerrie Dolan, Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc., Does through 10, amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VERIFICATION; INDEX OF EXHIBITS filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen(lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 order For Order Wed 04/09 1:55 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Plaintiff admits he did not provide notice of the Application or contact Defendants regarding its substance prior to filing the Application. Dkt. 2 at 7. Accordingly, the Application is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff can refile his motion after complying with Local Rule 7-19.1. (lc)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/09 8:10 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Victor Rene Martinez. (lc)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:43 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Kerrie Dolan. (lc)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:42 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Norberto Martinez. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Steven Richard Gittleman. (lc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:40 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc. (lc)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Lodging Fri 04/04 1:38 PM
LODGED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE2 filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/04 1:35 PM
(AMENDED) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen, (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing incomplete, or incorrret. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:11 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order2 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 04/03 5:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/03 5:08 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Douglas Kruschen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 04/03 5:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 10 pgs motion Order Thu 04/03 5:05 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS KRUSCHEN;[PROPOSED] ORDER, filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 04/03 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Annandale Townhouse Association, Inc., Does, Kerrie Dolan, Steven Richard Gittleman, Norberto Martinez, Victor Rene Martinez.Case assigned to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 405:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Douglas Kruschen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71