Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00511
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 12:56 AM MST
Defendant
Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Jeanette Elizabeth Alvarado
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Luis Angel Carrillo-Torres (2)
Represented By
Carlos Anthony Brown
Carlos A Brown PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Harry Bryan
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 2:27 AM MST
Thursday, March 06, 2025
Arrest of Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia, Luis Angel Carillo-Torres on 3/6/2025. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia, Luis Angel Carillo-Torres. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia and Luis Angel Carillo-Torres held on 3/7/2025. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN as to Carrillo-Garcia (Def 1), DEFENDANT AVOWS AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS as to Carrillo-Torres (Def 2). Appointing AFPD Jeanette Elizabeth Alvarado for Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia, and CJA Attorney Carlos Anthony Brown for Luis Angel Carillo-Torres. Spanish Interpreter required for both Defendants. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Aron Ketchel on behalf of William Bryan for the Government, AFPD Jeanette Alvarado for Defendant 1, and CJA Attorney Carlos Brown for Defendant 2. Defendants are present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Isabel Fierros assists Defendants. Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Hearings set for 3/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. Related [+] Hearing held 2:47 PM to 2:52 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia. (KGM) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 3/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: This is the time set for a Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Hearings as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia. Preliminary Hearing waived. The Court accepts the Defendant's waiver and finds that probable cause has been established. The Government is seeking detention. Detention Hearing submitted. The Court finds that the Defendant is a flight risk and is ordered detained pending trial. Appearances : AUSA William Bryan for the Government, AFPD Jeanette Alvarado for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. SPANISH Interpreter Matt Ren assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 10:58 AM to 11:03 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 3/13/25. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 3/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: This is the time set for a Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Hearings as to Luis Angel Carillo-Torres. Preliminary Hearing waived. The Court accepts the Defendant's waiver and finds that probable cause has been established. The Government is seeking detention. Detention Hearing submitted. The Court finds that the Defendant is a flight risk and is ordered detained pending trial. Appearances : AUSA William Bryan for the Government, CJA Attorney Carlos Brown for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. SPANISH Interpreter Matt Ren assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 10:58 AM to 11:03 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luis Angel Carillo-Torres. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 3/13/25. (SMF) [2:25-mj-03106-MTM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia (1) counts 1, 2, Luis Angel Carrillo-Torres (2) counts 1, 2 with Forfeiture Allegation. Arraignment set for 4/9/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. (KJ)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
13 13 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia (1), Luis Angel Carrillo-Torres (2). (KJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Luis Miguel Carrillo-Garcia, Luis Angel Carrillo-Torres. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summaries