Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-05834
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 12:59 AM MST
Defendant
Miguel Angel Lopez-Escobedo (1)
Represented By
J Bert Vargas
Bv Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 2:32 AM MST
Monday, March 31, 2025
Arrest of Miguel Angel Lopez-Escobedo on 3/31/2025. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Miguel Angel Lopez-Escobedo. (SIB)
Related: [-]