Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00560
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Carlos Canil-Chitic (1)
Represented By
Vanessa Mendoza
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cahal Patrick McColgan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 3:40 AM CDT
Saturday, March 08, 2025
Arrest of Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (cb7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Canil-Chitic (1), filed. (Starr) Initial Appearance set for 3/10/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (ngb7) (ngb7). [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Carlos Canil-Chitic held on 3/10/2025. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Samuel Lucas Delcolle, AUSA; Amanda Diane Austin, AFPD. (PTS: Susana Vargas) (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor/used) (DUSM: Andre Rodriguez) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Vanessa Mendoza, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (Mendoza, Vanessa) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Cahal Patrick McColgan appearing for USA, filed. (McColgan, Cahal) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (cb7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Carlos Canil-Chitic (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Carlos Canil-Chitic. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Carlos Canil-Chitic. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (bao7) [7:25-mj-00454]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Carlos Canil-Chitic (1) count(s) 1, filed. (yi7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Carlos Canil-Chitic, filed. (yi7)
Related: [-]