Texas Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00172
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 3:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Martin Maldonado-Flores (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Austin
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Jose I. Gonzalez-Falla
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Roberto L. Rodriguez
Law Office Of Roberto L. Rodriguez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
G. Karthik Srinivasan
Us Attorney'S Office - Western District Of Texas
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 4:30 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
Attorney G. Karthik Srinivasan for USA added (jg3) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores (jg3) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Mark Lane as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores (1). (jg3) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. (Srinivasan, G.) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane:Initial Appearance as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores held on 3/18/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (klw) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order Regarding Financial Status as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (klw) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-Austin for Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (klw) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. Detention / Preliminary Hearing set for 4/1/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (klw) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jose I. Gonzalez-Falla appearing for Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores . Attorney Jose I. Gonzalez-Falla added to party Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores(pty:dft) (Gonzalez-Falla, Jose) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Appointment for New Counsel by Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. (Gonzalez-Falla, Jose) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores (1). Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (yl) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
10 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. (klw) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 Waiver of Detention Hearing by Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores (Rodriguez, Roberto) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
12 12 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores (Rodriguez, Roberto) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (jg3) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
True Name of Defendant as to Jose Martin Maldanado-Flores. True name of defendant is: JOSE MARTIN MALDONADO-FLORE as reflected in the indictment. (co) [1:25-mj-00309-ML]
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Martin Maldonado-Flores (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
16 16 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Martin Maldonado-Flores (bot1)
Related: [-]