California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01558
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 12:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Santos Mondragon-Sanchez (1)
Represented By
Nathan Feneis
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 1:50 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Arrest of Santos Mondragon-Sanchez (no document attached) (cxl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez.(cxl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez: Initial Appearance set for 4/2/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brendan Barber appearing for USA. (Barber, Brendan)Attorney Brendan Barber added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez held on 4/2/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Santos Mondragon-Sanchez. Detention Hearing as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez held on 4/2/2025. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion denied as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez. Bond set as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and 10% cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/16/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 4/29/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) Judge update in case as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added to the case. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25MJ1558-DDL (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 4/2/2025 MDD 25-1:3:11-3:41). (Plaintiff Attorney Connor Veneski AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Dang FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Santos Mondragon-Sanchez (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (pdc)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Santos Mondragon-Sanchez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/2/25. (rab)
Related: [-]