California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01536
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 12:35 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Target Devices identified in the Jonathan Laroche Investigation (1)
Terminated: 04/02/2025


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 10:27 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 31 pgs Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Target Devices identified in the Jonathan Laroche Investigation. (gac)
Related: [-]