Kansas District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-40017
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Lucretia Miller (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Skipper Seay Jacobs
Office Of United States Attorney - Topeka
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 3:18 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Lucretia Miller: Initial Appearance set for 4/10/2025 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 404 (RES) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. (msb)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT filed against defendant Lucretia Miller (1) as to count 1. (msb)
Related: [-]