New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00597
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 1:48 AM MDT
Defendant
Alvaro Rolando Batalla-Negrete (1)
Represented By
Francisco Valcarcel
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Diana Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabeth Tonkin
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 3:13 AM MDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Arrest of Alvaro Rolando Batalla-Negrete (kls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Hearing as to Alvaro Rolando Batalla-Negrete: Initial Appearance set for 4/3/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls)
Related: [-]