Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00795
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (1)
Represented By
Jesse R. Coronado
Law Offices Of Jesse R. Coronado
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 4:08 AM CDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
Arrest of Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
Warrant Returned Executed as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez. (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez. (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez. (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez. (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez held on 3/7/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2025 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jesse R. Coronado for Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez appointed. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (Coronado, Jesse) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (r013) [2:25-mj-00621-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Julio Cesar Gonzalez Fernandez (bot1)
Related: [-]