Original Case: 1:22-cv-12002

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01310
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
API TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By
Madison Keller
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Shapiro
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WEIXING VINCENT WANG
Represented By
Weixing Vincent Wang
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 5:51 AM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #223) filed by Appellant Weixing Vincent Wang. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/17/2025. 25-1310 (ALW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF