Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Daniel P Jordan, III
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:25-cv-00234
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 11:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Vicksburg Warren School District
Plaintiff
Melissa Broome
Represented By
Kevin W. Frye
Kevin W. Frye, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 9:46 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys Janet H. Goode and Justin S. Gilbert be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 4/18/2025. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 04/18 10:32 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: Court staff modified docket to show served dated of 4/16/2025, updated answer to show 5/7/2025. (cwl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Broome. Vicksburg Warren School District served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. (Frye, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attachment Thu 04/17 2:15 PM
ATTACHMENT re4 MOTION for Justin S. Gilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5653403) by Melissa Broome(Frye, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/18 10:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Vicksburg Warren School District answer due 5/7/2025. (cwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 10:15 AM
MOTION for Justin S. Gilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5653403) by Melissa Broome (Frye, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 10:11 AM
MOTION for Janet H. Goode to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5653398) by Melissa Broome(Frye, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificates of Good Standing
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Vicksburg Warren School District. (CDS) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/4/2025) (CDS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 8:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Vicksburg Warren School District (Filing fee $405 paid receipt number AMSSDC-5653171), filed by Melissa Broome.(CDS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet