Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:25-bk-02117
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Marion Realty Group LLC
10158 Celtic Ash Dr
Ruskin, FL 33573-6731
Represented By
Samantha L Dammer
Bleakley Bavol Denman & Grace
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Wed 04/30 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Samantha L. Dammer Esq., as Attorney for Debtor Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 . Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC (related document(s)13 ). (Dammer, Samantha
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Application to Employ/Retain Mon 04/28 9:01 AM
Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Samantha L. Dammer Esq., as Attorney for Debtor Related [+]. Service Instructions: Samantha Dammer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/23 5:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew B Klein on behalf of Creditor Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity, but solely as trustee of MFA 2021-INV2 Trust. (Klein, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 04/11 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/11 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf Tue 04/08 9:13 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Mon 04/07 6:02 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2025 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2025. (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 3 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Fri 04/04 3:38 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Amy Denton Mayer added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for May 2, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. telephonically via US Trustee - Tampa/Ft. Myers. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Dorr, Teresa)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement (BK) Fri 04/04 12:22 PM
Statement Regarding Business Records Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
5 5 misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Fri 04/04 12:19 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Fri 04/04 12:17 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs motion Application to Employ/Retain Fri 04/04 12:14 PM
Application to Employ Samantha L. Dammer as Attorney for Debtor Contains negative notice. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 04/04 12:03 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Debtor Marion Realty Group LLC. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/04 12:02 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Marion Realty Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/3/2025. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 04/04 12:05 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:25-bk-02117] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79161793, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 04/04 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]