Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:25-bk-60016

New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patrick G Radel
Case #: 6:25-ap-80007
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Trevor S. Dugan
3689 County Route 14
Madrid, NY 13660
Represented By
Laura M. Harris Courage
Harris-Courage, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank of Omaha
1620 Dodge Street Stop 3105
Omaha, NE 68197
Represented By
Gregg P. Tabakin
Fein, Such, Kahn & Shepard P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Neil Tarak Bhatt-Trustee
Bhatt Law Firm 536 State Street
Ogdensburg, NY 13669


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 04/03 3:55 PM
Summons Re-Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff/Plaintiff to Provide Service Upon the Defendant Trevor S. Dugan Answer Due 5/5/2025. (Sitcer, Katherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/03 3:25 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by First National Bank of Omaha. (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/03 3:18 PM
Summons Issued on Trevor S. Dugan Answer Due 05/5/2025 (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint(COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/03 3:17 PM
Adversary case 25-80007 6. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Trevor S. Dugan. Fee Amount $ 350.. (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B