Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:25-cv-00352
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
175 Berkeley Street
Boston, MA 02117
Plaintiff
RRF Holding Company, LLC
7815 Walton Parkway
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
Damion M Clifford
Arnold & Clifford LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RRI West Management, LLC
7815 Walton Parkway
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
Damion M Clifford
Arnold & Clifford LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Red Roof Franchising, LLC
7815 Walton Parkway
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
Damion M Clifford
Arnold & Clifford LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Red Roof Inns, Inc.
7815 Walton Parkway
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
Damion M Clifford
Arnold & Clifford LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company answer due 5/20/2025 per17 (Stipulation) (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 04/25 10:27 AM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Sarnowski, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 10:57 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 ,14 ,15 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shattuck Ely, J Alexander Prescott, and Jonathan L Spratling as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/23/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10475220) of Jonathan Spratling by Plaintiffs RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
14 14 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10475213) of J. Alexander Prescott by Plaintiffs RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10475157) of Shattuck Ely by Plaintiffs RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/18 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return of Service
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 04/11 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (ds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/10 3:28 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/10 3:26 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 order Related Case Memorandum Thu 04/10 10:08 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case number 2:19-cv-755 and 2:25-cv-352 are NOT related. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on April 9, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/04 11:39 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. of Related Cases (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 11:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 11:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RRI West Management, LLC. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 11:35 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RRF Holding Company, LLC. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 11:34 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Red Roof Franchising, LLC. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10449232), filed by Red Roof Inns, Inc., RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC. (Clifford, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit AA,
Att: 4 Exhibit AB,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I,
Att: 13 Exhibit J,
Att: 14 Exhibit K,
Att: 15 Exhibit L,
Att: 16 Exhibit M,
Att: 17 Exhibit N,
Att: 18 Exhibit O,
Att: 19 Exhibit P,
Att: 20 Exhibit Q,
Att: 21 Exhibit R,
Att: 22 Exhibit S,
Att: 23 Exhibit T,
Att: 24 Exhibit U,
Att: 25 Exhibit V,
Att: 26 Exhibit W,
Att: 27 Exhibit X,
Att: 28 Exhibit Y,
Att: 29 Exhibit Z