Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-12310

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Catherine J Furay
Case #: 1:25-ap-00009
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
PHH Mortgage
33 East Main Stree Suite 610
Madison, WI 53703
Represented By
PHH Mortgage
contact info
Defendant
PPH Mortgage Corporation
2000 Midlantic Drive Suite 410-A
Mount Laurel, NJ 08054
Represented By
PPH Mortgage Corporation
contact info
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the registered Noteholders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2005-3
15W030 North Frontage Road Suite 200
Burr Ridge, IL 60527
Represented By
HSBC Bank USA, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the registered Noteholders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2005-3
contact info
Defendant
Codilis, Moody & Circelli P.C.
100 Wilburn Road Suite 100
Sun Praire, WI 53590
Represented By
Codilis, Moody & Circelli P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas J Kovarik
N 16029 County Hwy B
Butternut, WI 54514
Represented By
Matthew C. Lein
Lein Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna R Kovarik
N 16029 County Hwy B
Butternut, WI 54514
Represented By
Matthew C. Lein
Lein Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/09 4:43 PM
Adversary Case Closed 25-00009 . (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 court Hearing: Canceled Wed 04/23 4:38 PM
Pretrial Conference Canceled re: Complaint . Originally scheduled for 06/24/2025 at 01:30 PM . Canceled due to: Dismissal by Plaintiff. Related [+]. (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Wed 04/23 12:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Related Docket 10 filed by Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik.(Lein, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificae of Service
utility Generic Notification - Refer to Manual (auto form) Wed 04/23 10:24 AM
Clerk's Notification to Attorney Lein Your document(s) is deficient. [NOTE: PDF does not match docketing event] Filing and noticing requirements can be found in the ECF User's Manual. Search for the topic Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff . Related document(s)10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Thomas J Kovarik, Plaintiff Donna R Kovarik. (Madison, Tibby) Modified on 4/23/2025 (tt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/22 4:23 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Matthew C. Lein on behalf of Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik. (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 4/23/2025 (tt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 court Hearing: Canceled Fri 04/18 2:51 PM
Hearing Canceled re: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Originally scheduled for 04/21/2025 at 10:00 AM . Canceled due to: motion withdrawn. Related [+]. (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 miscad Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/18 12:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Daniel Martin Solar on behalf of Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik. (Solar, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Strike Fri 04/18 12:21 PM
Motion to Strike filed by Daniel Martin Solar on behalf of Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik. Related document(s)5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Thomas J Kovarik, Plaintiff Donna R Kovarik. (Solar, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (auto form) Fri 04/18 11:29 AM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . If you wish to appear by telephone, call the Court conference line at 1-855-244-8681, meeting number 23166492589, to participate in this telephonic hearing. ***This docket entry serves as electronic notice.*** Related [+]. (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
utility Generic Notification - Refer to Manual (auto form) Tue 04/15 8:58 AM
Clerk's Notification to Attorney Daniel M. Solar Your document(s) is deficient. [Affidavit/Certificate of Good Standing and Proposed Order (PLEASE NOTE: proper filing formats for proposed orders) are required]. Filing and noticing requirements can be found in the ECF User's Manual. Search for the topic Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Related document(s)5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Thomas J Kovarik, Plaintiff Donna R Kovarik. (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 2:05 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Daniel Martin Solar on behalf of Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik. (Solar, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 miscad Proof of Service Wed 04/09 1:56 PM
Proof of Service filed by Matthew C. Lein on behalf of Donna R Kovarik, Thomas J Kovarik. Related document(s)2 Summons Issued. (Lein, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
miscad Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/07 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Mark Harring. (Standing Trustee's Office, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Fri 04/04 11:53 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 4/4/2025. Related [+]. (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto form) Fri 04/04 11:49 AM
Summons to be served by 4/11/2025. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/24/2025 at 01:30 PM at Telephone Conference on Complaint . Summons Issued on Codilis, Moody & Circelli P.C. Answer Due 5/5/2025; HSBC Bank USA, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the registered Noteholders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2005-3 Answer Due 5/5/2025; PHH Mortgage Answer Due 5/5/2025; PPH Mortgage Corporation Answer Due 5/5/2025. Related [+]. (Madison, Tibby)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 9:45 AM
Adversary case 1 25-00009 Complaint filed by Thomas J Kovarik, Donna R Kovarik against PHH Mortgage, PPH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the registered Noteholders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2005-3, Codilis, Moody & Circelli P.C. [ Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) (Lein, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1A Loan Documents
Att: 2 EX. 1B Loan Documents
Att: 3 Ex. 2 - Modification
Att: 4 Ex. 3 - Mortgage Statement
Att: 5 Ex. 3 - Mortgage Statement_Redacted
Att: 6 Ex. 4 - Check to Snyder Trust Account_Redacted
Att: 7 Ex. 5 - Check from Snyder to PHH_Redacted
Att: 8 Ex. 6 - Snyder Correspondence re Check to PHH_Redacted
Att: 9 Ex. 7A - Kovarik Thomas 2024 09 13 RFI Payoff and TILA
Att: 10 Ex. 7B - Kovarik Thomas 2024 09 20 USPS Delivery RFI Payoff and TILA
Att: 11 Ex. 8 - Kovaril Thomas 2024 10 01 RFI Response- Owner (2)
Att: 12 Ex. 9 - Kovarik Thomas 2024 10 03 Payoff Quote (2)_Redacted
Att: 13 Ex. 10 - Objection to Confirmation
Att: 14 Ex. 11 - POC