Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Case #: 3:25-cv-00530
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
ITG Brands, LLC
Plaintiff
Joseph Sullivan
Represented By
James V. Sabatini
Sabatini & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/23 5:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Sullivan. ITG Brands, LLC served on 4/9/2025, answer due 4/30/2025. (Sabatini, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *ITG Brands, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James V. Sabatini* *Sabatini & Associates* *One Market Square* *Newington, CT 06111*. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 04/07 3:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,7 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,5 Standing Protective Order,1 Complaint filed by Joseph Sullivan Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 intord Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols Mon 04/07 3:48 PM
Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Attachment
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 04/07 3:47 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 04/07 3:46 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/4/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 04/07 3:45 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/4/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 04/07 3:44 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2025 Discovery due by 10/6/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2025 Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2025.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 10:46 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2025.(Higgins, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against ITG Brands, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8124963.), filed by Joseph Sullivan.(Sabatini, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 04/04 5:06 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to ITG Brands, LLC. (Sabatini, James)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Mon 04/07 11:47 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Victor A. Bolden assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]