ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH et al v. FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Loren L Alikhan |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01013 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 27:185 Enforcement of Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 5:09 PM EDT |
Petitioner
ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 7:18 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus V. A. Levy on behalf of ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH (Levy, Marcus) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Von Mehren on behalf of ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH (Von Mehren, Paige) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/15 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Petitioners' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and PAIGE VON MEHREN is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civ. R. 83.6(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 04/15/2025. (lclla1) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/15 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Petitioners' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and MARCUS V. A. LEVY is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civ. R. 83.6(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 04/15/2025. (lclla1) |
||
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/07 8:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Marcus V.A. Levy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11593033. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH.(Livshiz, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paige von Mehren, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11593027. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH.(Livshiz, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by David Yury Livshiz on behalf of ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH (Livshiz, David) |
|
3 | 3
![]() LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH (Livshiz, David) |
|
2 | 2
![]() LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH (Livshiz, David) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PETITION TO ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11592728.) filed by ERSTE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH, ZWEITE NORDSEE-OFFSHORE HOLDING GMBH.(Livshiz, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |