Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00471
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
DANIELLE COLEMAN
Represented By
MIRIAM FRESCO AGRAIT
Rubenstein Law - Miami Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AGRAIT, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 2:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AGRAIT, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/08 1:08 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice of Deficiency - The4 Civil Cover Sheet, is not the correct form and was not properly completed. Please file a fully executed civil cover sheet, NDFL JS 44 found on our website. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 12:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AGRAIT, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/08 11:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice of Deficiency - The case caption on the Complaint does not comply with PTO No. 4, MDL No. 3140, and must be corrected by the filing of an Amended Complaint within 14 days. (Amended Complaint due on or before 4/22/2025 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Fri 04/04 3:53 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The attached Civil Cover Sheet, is unreadable. Please refile, but not as a fillable form. Re1 Complaint filed by DANIELLE COLEMAN (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 66 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9427087.), filed by DANIELLE COLEMAN. (AGRAIT, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet