New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:25-cv-02345
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Superior court of New Jersey Ocean County, OCN-L-00779-25
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Defendant
ABC LLCS 1-10
Defendant
ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-10
Defendant
COSTCO WHOLESALE
Represented By
ROBERT A. BALLOU
Garvey Ballou
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
JESSICA SNYDER
Represented By
WILLIAM DAVID WRIGHT
The Wright Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER SNYDER
Represented By
WILLIAM DAVID WRIGHT
The Wright Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 05/07 3:45 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by COSTCO WHOLESALE.(BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 misc Certification Wed 04/30 1:29 PM
Certification on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE.(BALLOU, ROBERT) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/30/2025) (amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Exhibit 1
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 04/30 3:04 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Refund of Fees7 filed by ROBERT BALLOU on 4/30/25 was submitted incorrectly as a Certification. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE APPLICATION USING *APPLICATION FOR REFUND OF FEES. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Wed 04/30 3:07 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application7 filed by ROBERT BALLOU on 4/30/25 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 04/22 12:12 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/22/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 1:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by COSTCO WHOLESALE.(BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Wed 04/16 2:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The5 Answer submitted by Robert Ballou on 4/16/2025 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 04/08 1:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE identifying costco as Corporate Parent.. (BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 04/08 11:49 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Civil cover sheet by COSTCO WHOLESALE. (BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 9:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: CHRISTOPHER SNYDER has not been added to the docket. In the future, make sure to add ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS as found on the original state court complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 04/07 9:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Mon 04/07 9:46 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The2 Notice of Removal was submitted incorrectly as an Affidavit. IN THE FUTURE please submit the Notice of Removal using the event Notice of Removal or in the alternative, Exhibit (to Document). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 9:47 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Mon 04/07 10:42 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 misc Affidavit Fri 04/04 4:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Complaint NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO. (BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against JESSICA SNYDER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16147957) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COSTCO.(BALLOU, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 10:44 AM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]