New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:25-cv-02338
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 5:13 PM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLCO (NA), INC
Defendant
KENVUE INC.
Defendant
PECOS RIVER TALC LLC
Defendant
RED RIVER TALC LLC
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF LILA TAYLOR-MILLER
Represented By
TARA KIRSTEN KING
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 10:46 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLCO (NA), INC, KENVUE INC., PECOS RIVER TALC LLC, RED RIVER TALC LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 9:00 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: BRUCE MILLER has been added as a Plaintiff in his individual capacity. PARTY TEXT for Estate of Lila Taylor-Miller has been updated to Bruce Miller as the anticipated administrator of the estate. Please make note of these changes for future filings . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 04/07 10:47 AM
Member Case Direct File on 4/4/2025, for MDL 2738. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLCO (NA), INC, KENVUE INC., PECOS RIVER TALC LLC, RED RIVER TALC LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16147663) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ESTATE OF LILA TAYLOR-MILLER.(KING, TARA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet