California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-12796
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Capo 35191 LLC
24325 Crenshaw Blvd
Torrance, CA 90505-5349
Represented By
Krystina T Tran
Law Offices Of Krystina T Tran
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - Ch 11 to 7 (BNC)
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 misc Notice of UST's motion to dism or conv (11 to 7) (BNC) Mon 04/28 4:22 PM
Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - chapter 11 to 7 (BNC) (MB2)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice to Pay Court Costs Due (BNC Option) Mon 04/28 4:20 PM
Notice to Pay Court Costs Due Sent To: Krystina T Tran, Total Amount Due $0 . (MB2)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Mon 04/28 4:19 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/29/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 14 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA)
14 14 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Mon 04/28 2:35 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert U.S. Trustee's Notice of Motion and Motion under 11 U.S.C.1112(b) to Dismiss, Convert, or Direct the Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Madoyan, Noreen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 04/18 11:51 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Requires a motion - please follow the LBR 2091-1(a)(2). Related [+] (MB2)
Related: [-] 12 Substitution of attorney filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 misc Substitution of attorney Thu 04/17 4:07 PM
Substitution of attorney with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC. (Tran, Krystina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/10 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/09 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/09 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/09 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2) Tue 04/08 2:26 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/5/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/7/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/1/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual or Joint Debtors under Subchapter V) (309E2) Tue 04/08 2:25 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/5/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999.Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 7/7/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/1/2025. (LL2). Warning: Incorrect Notice was generated. See docket entry no7 for correct notice. Modified on 4/8/2025 (LL2)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Mon 04/07 3:53 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (NV)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Mon 04/07 12:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 5/13/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
3 3 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/07 12:45 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference. Status Conference Hearing set on May 13, 2025 at 1:00 P.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/7/2025 (MB2)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Mon 04/07 11:34 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee . Mark M Sharf (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Madoyan, Noreen)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Mon 04/07 3:47 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 4/18/2025.**No holographic signature of debtor** Incomplete Filings due by 4/18/2025. (NV)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Mon 04/07 3:48 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 4/18/2025. (NV)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Capo 35191 LLC
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/04 2:10 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Capo 35191 LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 04/18/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/18/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/18/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/18/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/18/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/18/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/18/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/18/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/18/2025. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 04/18/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/18/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/18/2025. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 04/18/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 04/18/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/18/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/3/2025. (Tran, Krystina)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 04/04 2:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-12796] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58250225. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1