Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:25-cv-00618
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-25-914009-C
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Kirk Johnson
Represented By
Kathryn Newman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Martin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Christine Prouty
Represented By
Kathryn Newman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Martin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Monica Strauss
Represented By
Kathryn Newman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Martin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division
Represented By
Kathryn Newman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Martin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Sanchez
Represented By
Steven D. Sabel
Sabel Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Fri 05/16 8:16 PM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulation to Reschedule Date for Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Zoom Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
19 19 motion Stipulation Thu 05/15 4:41 PM
STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE DATE FOR EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION (FIRST REQUEST) by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. (Newman, Kathryn) (other) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
18 18 respm Reply Mon 05/12 4:37 PM
REPLY to Response to9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 05/06 2:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVED ACTION by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 respm Response Mon 05/05 8:06 PM
RESPONSE to9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Alexis Sanchez. Replies due by 5/12/2025. (Sabel, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexis Sanchez. Monica Strauss waiver sent on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/28/2025. (Sabel, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/23 11:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexis Sanchez. Kirk Johnson waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025. (Sabel, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/23 11:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexis Sanchez. Christine Prouty waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025. (Sabel, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 04/22 2:28 PM
ORDER. The Court DENIES without prejudice the 11 motion to toll the answer deadline pending resolution of a partial motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 04/21 4:58 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND ITS ANSWER PENDING DECISION ON DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS re7 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. Responses due by 5/5/2025. (Newman, Kathryn) (answer)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Mon 04/21 2:17 PM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Zoom Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion Dismiss Mon 04/21 10:22 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. Responses due by 5/5/2025. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement in Removal Case Mon 04/21 10:12 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/14 1:41 PM
ORDER Granting6 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division answer due 4/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) Modified on 4/14/2025 to correct docket text. Extension of date to file answer is for defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division only. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 motion Stipulation Fri 04/11 1:37 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division. (Newman, Kathryn) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Other Fri 04/11 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alexis Sanchez. (Sabel, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 04/07 8:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/7/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/22/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ENE Notice Mon 04/07 8:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 04/04 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division (HCA Healthcare. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 04/04 3:07 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-25-914009-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-8009657) by Monica Strauss, Kirk Johnson, Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division (HCA Healthcare, Christine Prouty. Proof of service due by 6/3/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/14/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Newman, Kathryn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 04/07 8:11 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
Related: [-]