Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sidney A Fitzwater
Case #: 3:25-cv-00838
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:at Law No. 1 in Dallas County, Texas, CC-25-01580-A
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 5:09 PM CDT
Defendant
Fiesta Mart, LLC d/b/a Fiesta Mart #68
Represented By
Maryalyce Cox
Mehaffyweber PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Renata Cole


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
10 10 order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 05/09 4:38 PM
TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2026 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. This case is set for trial on the date indicated above, for a two-week docket. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/09 4:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2025. Discovery due by 4/10/2026. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2025. Motions due by 5/8/2026. Status Report due by 4/10/2026. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/09 4:39 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Fri May 9 16:39:17 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Mon 05/05 4:39 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Discovery Control Plan by Renata Cole. (Verich, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/30 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Fiesta Mart, LLC d/b/a Fiesta Mart #68. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/30/2025) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/30 4:02 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Apr 30 16:02:34 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 04/21 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Renata Cole. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Verich, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
misc Order Receipt Fri 04/11 3:40 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Apr 11 15:40:30 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 04/08 9:09 AM
ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/5/2025. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/7/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
4 4 qcref Fitzwater Mon 04/07 10:33 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kaf)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/07 10:40 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Apr 7 10:40:33 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 motion Leave to File Fri 04/04 4:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Fiesta Mart, LLC d/b/a Fiesta Mart #68 (Cox, Maryalyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiesta Mart, LLC d/b/a Fiesta Mart #68. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cox, Maryalyce)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/04 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Fiesta Mart, LLC d/b/a Fiesta Mart #68. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15399130) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cox, Maryalyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Cover Sheet Supplement