New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:25-bk-41678
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Don Kew Inc
11911 Metropolitan Ave
Kew Gardens, NY 11415-2605
Represented By
Lawrence Morrison
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/12 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/10 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Leo V. Gagion on behalf of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance (Gagion, Leo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Thu 04/10 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Thu 04/10 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Wed 04/09 9:35 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/19/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/07 2:46 PM
Court's Service List Related [+] (jag)
Related: [-] 8 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
8 8 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Mon 04/07 2:44 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 4/7/2025. Status hearing to be held on 6/5/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (jag)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) Mon 04/07 12:58 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc Related [+] (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 5 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
6 6 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Form 104 or Form 204 Mon 04/07 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc Related [+] (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 5 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Mon 04/07 12:36 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/4/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/4/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/4/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/4/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/18/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/18/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 4/18/2025. (jag)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs motion Employ (Application) Fri 04/04 4:31 PM
Application to Employ Morrison Tenenbaum PLLC as Counsel to Debtor Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 04/04 4:29 PM
Declaration Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Fri 04/04 4:27 PM
Statement Pursuant to LBR 1073-2(b) Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/04 4:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of Don Kew Inc Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/4/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/4/2025. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 04/04 4:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 25-41678 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23498312. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1