California Central District Court
Judge:John D Early
Case #: 8:25-cv-00684
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 2:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Barbara E. Ashwill
Defendant
EMT Auto Repair, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/01 4:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant EMT Auto Repair, Inc. served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon EDGAR T MONTIELTELLEZ, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/08 9:13 AM
This case has been assigned to a magistrate judge under the Direct Assignment of Civil Cases to Magistrate Judges Program. Per Local Civil Rule 73-2.1, Plaintiff(s) is/are directed to serve, forthwith, the Notice of Assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form (Dkt. 5, "Notice") upon each defendant at the time of service of process, and, within three (3) days of such service, file proof(s) of such service, including service of the Notice. If Plaintiff(s) submit(s) a compliant Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk's Office as explained in the Notice within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Notice, compliance with the foregoing is excused. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/07 4:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Barbara E. Ashwill, EMT Auto Repair, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 04/07 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 04/04 1:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/04 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/04 1:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/04 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39446879 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]