Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Case #: 2:25-cv-14103
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Inquiry by James Alexander Logan. Copy of Complaint and Exhibit mailed to Plaintiff. (cwc) Text Modified on 5/13/2025 (cwc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 04/04 3:59 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (dp01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 04/04 10:39 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Fri 04/04 10:26 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections, Martin Correctional Institution. Filing fee $ 405.00 (not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by James Alexander Logan.(kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Disciplinary Reports, Grievances, and Inmate Requests