Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:25-cv-10977
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Leslie Wolschleger
Represented By
Warren Astbury
Astbury Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sika Corporation
Represented By
Katherine J Van Dyke
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 17 2025
ADMINISTRATIVE INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 notice Appear* Tue 05/06 8:26 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 05/06 8:24 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 5/6/2025 is Cancelled re11 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (HRya)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Settlement Conference held on 5/6/2025. Disposition: Parties to continue negotiations between themselves. Court to reset preliminary injunction hearing to be held in June if parties do not reach resolution. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
minutes Status Conference Mon 05/05 3:49 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 5/5/2025. At the request of both parties, the hearing on the pending motion for preliminary injunction is being converted into a virtual settlement conference. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
minutes Status Conference Thu 05/01 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 5/1/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AFla)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 notice Appear* Fri 04/25 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 04/25 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/25/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 notice Appear* Wed 04/23 4:05 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 04/23 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2025 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 12:37 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
minutes Hearing Not Held/Hearing Cancelled Thu 04/17 12:03 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing Not Held. Court conducted settlement conference. Proceedings to continue as indicated on the record. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 trial Exhibit Wed 04/16 7:08 PM
EXHIBIT Supplemental Exhibit in Support of re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Sika Corporation (Van Dyke, Katherine)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/16 11:36 AM
RESPONSE to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Leslie Wolschleger. (Astbury, Warren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 04/08 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 04/08 12:57 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sika Corporation (Van Dyke, Katherine)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/08 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/8/2025. Defendant to file response to motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (ECF No. 2) by not later than 12:00pm on April 16, 2025. Court to hold hearing on pending motion for TRO at 9:00am on April 17, 2025. Defendant shall personally appear at the hearing. Plaintiff to share results of computer forensics examination as soon as results are finalized. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 04/07 6:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Astbury on behalf of Leslie Wolschleger. (Astbury, Warren)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued* Mon 04/07 12:36 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Leslie Wolschleger* (LHam)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appear* Mon 04/07 10:03 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 04/07 12:38 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LHam)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/04 7:50 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Sika Corporation. (Van Dyke, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 37 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 13 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
1 1 19 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 04/04 7:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Sika Corporation against Leslie Wolschleger. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10186219 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Van Dyke, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3