Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:25-cv-01108
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Tanya Russell
P.O. Box 3400
Norfolk, VA 23514
Plaintiff
Discover Bank


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 notice Deficiency Notice-Non-Prisoner Mon 05/12 9:01 AM
Deficiency Notice for Tanya Russell re: (ECF No.1 Notice of Removal filed by Tanya Russell ); must be corrected by 5/27/2025 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 5.12.25)(IFP mailed 5.12.25)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 misc Supplement Mon 04/14 3:15 PM
Supplement to1 Notice of Removal filed by Tanya Russell(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Attachment
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Fri 04/04 8:58 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.4.25)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Fri 04/04 9:02 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (1-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 motion Vacate Fri 04/04 8:55 AM
MOTION to Vacate by Tanya Russell(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss Fri 04/04 8:54 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Tanya Russell(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/04 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Howard County, case number D-101-CV 24-00013 012, filed by Tanya Russell.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 State Documents