Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:25-cv-01745
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Re-opened:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAW DEPARTMENT
Defendant
JUDGE NICHOLAS N. D'ALESSANDRO
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Plaintiff
DWAYNE SHAW
446 SOUTH 62ND STREET 2ND FLOOR
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19143

GPO Apr 11 2025
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Apr 11 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1915. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM AS FOLLOWS: A. CLAIMS FOR PROSPECTIVE RELIEF AND STATE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. B. THE REMAINDER OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED & mE-MAILED.(fdc)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 04/28 10:46 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF DWAYNE SHAW'S9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/22/25.4/28/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/24 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by DWAYNE SHAW (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 misc Returned Mail Wed 04/23 8:21 AM
Copy of Order/Notice dated /3/25 (Document # 6) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DWAYNE SHAW for the following reason: UNABLE TO DELIVER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED.. (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Mon 04/14 11:35 AM
Retention Letter dated 4/11/24. Re: Return of discovery documents.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 request
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 9:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAW DEPARTMENT, NICHOLAS N. D'ALLESSONDRO, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, JOHN DOE, filed by DWAYNE SHAW.(fdc)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/14 9:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Brief filed by DWAYNE SHAW..(fdc)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Fri 04/11 10:30 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1915. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM AS FOLLOWS: A. CLAIMS FOR PROSPECTIVE RELIEF AND STATE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. B. THE REMAINDER OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED & mE-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Fri 04/11 10:25 AM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
misc Remark Wed 04/09 9:40 AM
Document 6 mailed to DWAYNE SHAW. (mac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Mon 04/07 11:05 AM
Retention Letter dated 4/3/24. Re: Return of discovery documents.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
5 5 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 04/04 3:56 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (fdc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Pro Se E-Notice Consent Form Fri 04/04 3:42 PM
Pro Se E-Notice Consent Form by DWAYNE SHAW consenting to e-notice at shawdwayne3@gmail.com (fdc)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 04/04 3:39 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by DWAYNE SHAW..(fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAW DEPARTMENT, NICHOLAS N. D'ALESSANDRO, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, JOHN DOE, filed by DWAYNE SHAW. *IFP PENDING*(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/04 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DWAYNE SHAW..(fdc)
Related: [-]