Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02779
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 2:25-cv-00370
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Gregory M Taube
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough (ga)
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By
Gregory M Taube
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough (ga)
contact info
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Plaintiff
Rocky Prather
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Charles Sigalis
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Petty
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Otis Petro
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ralph Edward Perdigone
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Joseph Pearce
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalie M. Parker
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Wright
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Marie Miller
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil Melton
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Keith Pyeatt
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Ropelato
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Josephine Ryals
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Kirk Sherwood
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Alfred Smith
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Somma-Hansen
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dianne South
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas James Stokes, Sr
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory E Stone
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pattis Wingo
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randy G Ward
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tori Donta Thompson
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Tremblay
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Lewis Torres
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilbert William Grajales
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Allen, Jr
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Evric Asberry
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aubrey Ray Austin
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Paul Bach
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Patrick Baird
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenyatta Carter
Plaintiff
Karen Marie Catalano
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra Cater
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Collelo
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Allen Couch
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francis England
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Eyton
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Danielle Freeman
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Teonna Maree Frye
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Joe Garcia
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie McGrotha
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Creig Griffin
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Guillot
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Patrick Hart
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Anthony Hashimoto
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Haulenbeek
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunjuyuhwa Henderson
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Marie Holland-Logan
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
William M Holmes, Jr
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Hughes
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Alexander Hurst
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Ilarrington, Jr
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Ann Kelley
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Debe Knudsen
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Theodore Lee
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andre Mangum
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 04/04 12:07 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 4/2/2025), 2:25-cv-00370, Prather et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02779-RMG (rhei, )
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 04/04 12:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:25-cv-00370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 2 pgs ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/4/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
3 3 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. have filed a consent motion to extend the deadline for all defendants to file responsive pleadings in this case. (Doc.2 ). The Court grants this motion and extends the defendants' responsive pleading deadline to 28 days following the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issuing a decision on whether to transfer this action to MDL No. 2873. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/17/2025. (CLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/4/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint (Assented-To) by CHEMGUARD, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Taube, Gregory) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/4/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4812264. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-904723. (), filed by CHEMGUARD, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(CLC). (Taube, Gregory) ALND Receipt # B-16736 Modified on 3/13/2025 (CLC). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/4/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-904723. (), filed by CHEMGUARD, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(CLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/4/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet