California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-02986
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 2:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Cynthia Yi-San Sun
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Paal Hjalmar Bakstad
Ltl Attorneyss LLP
contact info
Sabrina Celia Narain
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Artyom Akulyan
Represented By
Armine Markosyan
Law Offices Of Armine Markosyan
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/09 10:02 AM
ORDER RE DEFICIENCY by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 13 ("Motion")). The Motion does not include a statement of conferral or a hearing date as required by the Local Rules and the Court's Standing Order. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-3, 7-4; ECF No. 10. The Court hereby STRIKES the Motion without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a renewed Motion on or before May 23, 2025, curing the deficiencies identified in this Order. In light of the Motion, the Court hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for May 14, 2025. The Court will place the Scheduling Conference back on calendar for a future date if Plaintiff does not file a renewed Motion by the deadline or the Court denies the renewed Motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 05/05 1:26 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Motion to Remand13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
13 13 motion Remand Case to State Court Sat 05/03 1:52 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Burbank Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Artyom Akulyan. (Markosyan, Armine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 04/30 7:04 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC..(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Joint Rule 26 Report
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/11 2:20 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/11 2:13 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
9 9 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 04/11 1:28 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02986-SPG (SSCx). (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/11 11:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, served on 4/10/25.(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - MBUSA Notice to State Court re Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - MBUSA Email to Adverse Party
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/09 6:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 04/09 6:52 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-02986-CAS (SSCx). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Tue 04/08 3:52 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 4/08/25 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 04/07 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (mza)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/04 8:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/04 8:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/04 8:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24NNCV05363 Receipt No: ACACDC-39450348 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sabrina Narain in support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/07 4:29 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Artyom Akulyan. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/28/24. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/07 4:32 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT 4/4/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](mza)
Related: [-]