Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00667
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 2:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Rafael Salas
Salas & Salas L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 28 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt)
GPO May 07 2025
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (dt)

Docket last updated: 04/05/2025 3:57 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
Arrest of Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Rafael Salas for Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez appointed. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez held on 3/5/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (E. Gallegos) (Court Reporter ERO.) (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez, ( Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 3/17/2025 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez (Salas, Rafael) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (r013) [3:25-mj-00865-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Lesther Bladimir Munoz-Lopez (bot2)
Related: [-]