Montana District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00008
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 1:14 AM MDT
Defendant
Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brian Callan Lowney
United States Attorney'S Office District Of Montana
contact info
Zeno B. Baucus
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Billings
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2025 2:13 AM MDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
1 1 Duplicate Original COMPLAINT as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (1). (APP) (APP). [2:25-mj-00016-KLD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 (3/12/2025) Agent signed complaint,
Att: 3 (3/12/2025) Agent signed affidavit
Monday, March 17, 2025
Arrest of Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla in New Jersey. (APP) [2:25-mj-00016-KLD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 Rule 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (APP) [2:25-mj-00016-KLD]
Related: [-]
4 4 Rule 5 Documents Received for MT Deft Arrested in Another District as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (APP) [2:25-mj-00016-KLD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla Initial Appearance set for 4/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (TXB) [2:25-mj-00016-KLD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla, Interpreter is Needed. Arraignment set for 4/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Initial Appearance set for 4/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Interpreter request has been made, contract interpreter Masuma Chagani to interpret. (SGN)
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla (1) count(s) 1. (SGN)
Related: [-]
6 6 Redacted Indictment as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla. (SGN)
Related: [-]
7 7 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the5 Indictment (Sealed) as to Bhaveshkumar Dahyabhai Shukla. (SGN)
Related: [-]