Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01001
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 2:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Luis Flores-Aceves (1)
Represented By
Mary Carol Pietrazek
Pietrazek Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/05/2025 3:29 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Arrest of Jose Luis Flores-Aceves (drda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jose Luis Flores-Aceves. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Jose Luis Flores-Aceves. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Jose Luis Flores-Aceves. (drda)
Related: [-]