Willingboro Township School District v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-03051 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 1:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
TikTok Inc. 5800 Bristol Parkway Suite 100
Culver City, CA 90230 |
|
Defendant
Snap Inc.
3000 31st Street
Santa Monica, CA 90405 |
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
Alphabet, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Willingboro Township School District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Alphabet, Inc., ByteDance Inc., ByteDance, Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok Ltd., TikTok, LLC., YouTube, LLC. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/04 8:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (amf, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 04/04 11:43 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047, Opened in California Northern District as 4:25-cv-03051-YGR cc: JPMDL (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |