Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Timothy A Barnes
Case #: 1:25-bk-05275
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
301 W North Avenue, LLC
1525 N. Homer Suite 401
Chicago, IL 60642
Represented By
Robert W Glantz
Much Shelist, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Adam G. Brief
Office of the U. S. Trustee, Region 11 219 South Dearborn Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
51 51 motion Employ Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Notice of Motion and Application to Employ Brian D. Flanagan of Property Valuation Advisors, Inc. as Appraiser Filed by Robert W Glantz on behalf of 301 W North Avenue, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Glantz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
50 50 19 pgs order Adequate Protection Mon 04/28 10:08 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Interim Order Granting in Part, Continuing Motion To Use Cash Collateral Related [+], Granting Motion For Adequate Protection. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. Signed on 4/28/2025. (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-] 25 25
Friday, April 25, 2025
49 49 misc Appearance Fri 04/25 1:27 PM
Appearance Filed by Robert Radasevich on behalf of Peter O'Brien Sr., 315 W. North Ave., LP. (Radasevich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
48 48 order Maintain Prepetition Bank Accounts Thu 04/24 7:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Maintain Prepetition Bank Accounts Related [+], Granting Motion To Waive, Granting Motion to Shorten. Signed on 4/23/2025. (Mendoza, Laura)
Related: [-] 26 26 26
47 47 court Hearing Continued (Status) Wed 04/23 1:33 PM
(E)Hearing Continued. Status hearing Related [+] to be held on 06/04/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Keith, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
46 46 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/23 1:33 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 06/04/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Keith, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 25 Cash Collateral (Use); Adequate Protection
45 45 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/23 1:33 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 04/30/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Keith, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 33 Employ
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
44 44 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/22 10:53 AM
Proposed Order - Stipulation and Agreed Interim Order on Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Filed by Robert W Glantz on behalf of 301 W North Avenue, LLC Related [+]. (Glantz, Robert)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, Motion for Adequate Protection, 36 Hearing Motion Continued