Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01356
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 12:16 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sydney Yew
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Zeeshan Virani (1)
Terminated: 03/10/2025


Docket last updated: 04/06/2025 12:46 AM MST
Thursday, March 06, 2025
Arrest of Zeeshan Virani on 3/6/2025. (SYV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Zeeshan Virani. (SYV)
Related: [-]