Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00125
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:18 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kathryn Leigh Olson
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez (1)
Terminated: 03/11/2025
Represented By
Natalie Jihad Awad
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/06/2025 2:48 AM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest (Rule 40) of Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 3/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho (pns4)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez held on 3/7/2025. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed on the record. Court to appoint FPD. Defendant appeared with counsel. Brady order administered. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Detention hearing set for March 11, 2025 at 10 am before Judge Richard Bennett. Appearances: AUSA: K. Olson; FPD: T. Obando. (ERO: Yes) (Interpreter: No) Deft remanded to Custody of US Marshal, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release- Eastern District of Virginia Richmond Division as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez, filed. (pns4) Modified on 3/7/2025 (pns4).
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 02/26/2025; Returned Executed on 03/07/2025 as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER FOR LIMITED PURPOSE. Federal Public Defender - Houston for Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Trenald Zeshawn Robinson Ramirez Detention Hearing set for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]