California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00847
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Defendant
Todd Lyons
Defendant
Secretary KRISTI NOEM
Plaintiff
Student Doe # 1
Represented By
Stacy Eva Tolchin
Law Offices Of Stacy Tolchin
contact info
Khaled Alrabe
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:37 AM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
30 30 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 04/25 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)29 : The Notice of Clerical Error (Dkt. 29) was issued inadvertently in this action. The Court's Minute Order at Dkt. 27 is correct. (iva)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 04/25 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,27 . Document docketed in wrong case. Disregard Minute Order. (iva)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 2:45 PM
Notice OF SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. Supplemental (Farrell, Alexander)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/25 2:13 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DKT.21 ). This Order shall be in effect until May 10, 2025. The Court ORDERS Defendants TO SHOW CAUSE as to why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Defendants shall file any response by Friday May 2, 2025, and Plaintiff shall file any reply by noon on Wednesday May 7, 2025. The Court SETS a hearing on whether a preliminary injunction should issue on May 9, 2025 at 2:00P.M., via Zoom videoconference. (twdb)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Expedite Fri 04/25 2:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE BRIEFING DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes (DKT.23 ). Hearing date continued to 5/9/25 at 2:00 P.M. Opposition due 5/2/25. (twdb)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 04/25 1:39 PM
REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to to Prevent Arrest/Proceed with Student Status/Protective Order 21 filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1.(Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Stacy Tolchin & Exs A-C
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 04/24 12:09 PM
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to to Prevent Arrest/Proceed with Student Status/Protective Order 21 filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem.(Green, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander L. Farrell,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 motion Expedite Wed 04/23 10:00 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Related Cases [Dkt. 22] filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 04/23 9:55 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:25-cv-02993, 8:25-cv-00706, 2:25-cv-03528, filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
21 21 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/21 11:06 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to to Prevent Arrest/Proceed with Student Status/Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Tolchin Dec,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Sunday, April 20, 2025
20 20 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Sun 04/20 3:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 04/17 11:03 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,18 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The motion is hereby STRICKEN for failure to comply with L.R. 6-1. Counsel may file a corrected motion. Counsel is reminded to comply with the Local Rules and this Court's procedures. (iva)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 04/17 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed With Pseudonym and For Protective Order/Order Not to Detain 14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 8:24 PM
Notice of Errata re Dkt. 14-2 filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1.(Lai, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Corrected)
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/16 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Bartholomew Green counsel for Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. Adding Paul (Bart) Green as counsel of record for Defendants Kristi Noem, Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Kristi Noem, Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons. (Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Todd Lyons(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft))(Green, Paul)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/16 1:48 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Layne Farrell counsel for Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. Adding Alexander L. Farrell as counsel of record for Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons and Department of Homeland Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons and Department of Homeland Security. (Attorney Alexander Layne Farrell added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Layne Farrell added to party Todd Lyons(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Layne Farrell added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft))(Farrell, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
14 14 20 pgs motion Leave Mon 04/14 10:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed With Pseudonym and For Protective Order/Order Not to Detain filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Lai, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin & Exs A-D,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 04/10 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:25-cv-00847-SSS(SHKx). (ap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Thu 04/10 9:42 AM
Declination of Consent form received on 04/09/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kca) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 1:35 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. (san)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 04/08 10:05 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Lai counsel for Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. Adding Anne Lai as counsel of record for Student Doe #1 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Student Doe #1. (Attorney Anne Lai added to party Student Doe No. 1 (pty:pla))(Lai, Anne)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Related Case(s) Tue 04/08 7:26 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. Related Case(s): 2:25-cv-02993; 8:25-cv-00706 (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Tue 04/08 5:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Student Doe No. 1. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 04/08 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 04/08 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/08 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Student Doe # 1, (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
4 4 notice Appearance Sat 04/05 8:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Khaled Alrabe on behalf of Plaintiff Student Doe # 1 (Attorney Khaled Alrabe added to party Student Doe # 1(pty:pla))(Alrabe, Khaled)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Sat 04/05 8:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Student Doe # 1. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 04/05 8:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Student Doe # 1. (Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 04/05 8:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39451196 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Student Doe # 1. (Attorney Stacy Eva Tolchin added to party Student Doe # 1(pty:pla))(Tolchin, Stacy)
Related: [-]