Original Case: 8:25-cv-00951

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.us-01345
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit460 Other Statutes - Deportation
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 8:37 PM EDT
Amicus Supporting Appellee
ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
Represented By
Erwin Chemerinsky
UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, BERKELEY SCHOOL OF LAW
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
MARTHA MINOW
Represented By
Erwin Chemerinsky
UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, BERKELEY SCHOOL OF LAW
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
LAURENCE H. TRIBE, Professor
Represented By
Erwin Chemerinsky
UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, BERKELEY SCHOOL OF LAW
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KRISTI NOEM
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
TODD LYONS
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KENNETH GENALO
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
NIKITA BAKER
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PAMELA JO BONDI
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MARCO RUBIO
Represented By
Drew Curtis Ensign
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
John William Blakeley
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Erez R. Reuveni
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Yaakov M. Roth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
August E. Flentje
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher Ian Pryby
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KILMAR ARMANDO ABREGO GARCIA
Represented By
Andrew John Rossman
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Gordon Cooper
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Rina Gandhi
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JENNIFER STEFANIA VASQUEZ SURA
Represented By
Andrew John Rossman
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Gordon Cooper
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Rina Gandhi
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
A.A.V., a minor, by and through his next friend and mother, Jennifer Vasquez Sura
Represented By
Andrew John Rossman
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Gordon Cooper
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP
contact info
Rina Gandhi
MURRAY OSORIO PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 3:31 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:25-cv-00951-PX. Case manager: CBennett. [1001748389] 25-1345 CB [Entered: 04/04/2025 11:26 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by August E. Flentje for Nikita Baker, Pamela Jo Bondi, Kenneth Genalo, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem and Marco Rubio. [1001748390] 25-1345 August Flentje [Entered: 04/04/2025 11:37 PM]
Related: [-]