South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elisabetta Gm Gasparini
Case #: 6:25-bk-01299
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
R & H Motor Group, Inc.
6829 Evanton Loch Rd
Charlotte, NC 28278-8011
Represented By
Jason Michael Ward
Jason Ward Law, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Christine Brimm
P.O. Box 14805
Myrtle Beach, SC 29587
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 order Show Cause Order w/pdf image Tue 04/29 9:53 AM
Order And Rule To Show Cause RE: Failure to timely file schedules and statements. Party to Appear: Hani Ibrahim and/or any other representative(s) of Debtor. Document Served. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 order Employ (Application) Mon 04/28 2:34 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor To Employ Professional Related [+]. Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Ting, K)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 04/11 12:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 court Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/10 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 7 pgs motion Employ (Application) Wed 04/09 1:38 AM
Application to Employ Jason M. Ward as Debtor's Counsel with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Jason Michael Ward of Jason Ward Law, LLC on behalf of R & H Motor Group, Inc.. (Ward, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 order Status Conference (Subchapter V) Tue 04/08 1:58 PM
Order Setting Status Conference relating to: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) filed by Debtor R & H Motor Group, Inc. Document Served. Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. Pre-Status Report due by 5/13/2025. (Ting, K)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Mon 04/07 3:14 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephone - 341. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/1/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/16/2025. (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Mon 04/07 11:29 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Filed by US Trustee's Office Related [+].(Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Regarding Disinterestedness and Proposed Compensation
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/07 8:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Jason D Wyman of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP on behalf of Pinnacle Bank. (Wyman, Jason)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Mon 04/07 1:20 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)([LINK 25-01299 ) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A14323674, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
trustee Appointment of Trustee Mon 04/07 11:24 AM
Appointment of Trustee: Christine Brimm added to the case. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
2 2 misc Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing Sun 04/06 11:29 PM
Debtor's Request to Decline Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Jason Michael Ward of Jason Ward Law, LLC on behalf of R & H Motor Group, Inc.. (Ward, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) Sun 04/06 11:29 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Non-Individual Filed by Jason Michael Ward of Jason Ward Law, LLC on behalf of R & H Motor Group, Inc.. (Ward, Jason)
Related: [-]