Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-01712

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jacob A Brown
Case #: 3:25-ap-00024
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pro Funding, Inc.
12500 S. Cicero Avenue
Alsip, IL 60803
Represented By
Pro Funding, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Surge Transportation, Inc.
50 North Laura Street, Suite 1600
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Bradley R Markey
Thames Markey
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:13 PM
Service Executed on Pro Funding, Inc. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:12 PM
Service Executed on Pro Funding, Inc., c/o Laurie A. Montplaisir, Esq. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:10 PM
Service Executed on Pro Funding, Inc., c/o George L. Laforte, Jr., Agent of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:09 PM
Service Executed on Pro Funding, Inc., c/o Incorporating Services, Ltd., Registered Agent of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/07 8:57 AM
Summons issued on Pro Funding, Inc. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/07/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Fri 04/04 2:01 PM
Complaint by Surge Transportation, Inc. against Pro Funding, Inc.. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference