Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-01712

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jacob A Brown
Case #: 3:25-ap-00025
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
TAB Bank d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank
4185 Harrison Boulevard
Ogden, UT 84403
Represented By
TAB Bank d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Surge Transportation, Inc.
50 North Laura Street, Suite 1600
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Bradley R Markey
Thames Markey
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:22 PM
Service Executed on TAB Bank, d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:21 PM
Service Executed on TAB Bank, d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank, c/o Randall Rees, Esq. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:19 PM
Service Executed on TAB Bank, d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank, c/o Geoffrey J. Peters, Esq. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:16 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Service Executed on Saint John Capital of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley) Modified on 04/14/2025 (Perkins, Cathy)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:15 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Service Executed on Saint John Capital, c/o CT Corporation Systems, Registered Agent of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Plaintiff Surge Transportation, Inc. Related [+]. (Markey, Bradley) Modified on 04/14/2025 (Perkins, Cathy)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Mon 04/14 3:05 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Bradley Markey for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 3
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Mon 04/14 3:05 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Bradley Markey for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/07 8:57 AM
Summons issued on TAB Bank d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/07/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Fri 04/04 2:04 PM
Complaint by Surge Transportation, Inc. against TAB Bank d/b/a Transportation Alliance Bank. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference