Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vaco LLC
160 Mine Lake Court Suite 200
Raleigh, NC 27615
Represented By
Vaco LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
A. Scott McKellar
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 order Consent Order (No Motion) Tue 05/06 10:10 AM
Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer due 6/4/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
admis Pay Fee-AP Mon 04/14 10:57 AM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by James B Angell on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Angell, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Mon 04/14 10:58 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 25-00061 5-JNC] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18471612, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/08 2:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Vaco LLC 4/8/2025. filed by A. Scott McKellar on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 04/04 2:57 PM
Summons Issued on Vaco LLC Answer Due 05/5/2025 (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 2:57 PM
Adversary case 25-00061 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Vaco LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit