New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:25-cv-01889
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:06 PM EDT
Defendant
BSD OS LLC
Defendant
Wellspring Solutions LLC
Defendant
Vital Craft OS LLC
Defendant
TM OS LLC
Defendant
Yitzhak Rahman
Defendant
Mark Benjamin Pelta
Defendant
NexGen Line Inc.
Defendant
Luminex BK LLC
Defendant
John Doe Defendants "1" through "10"
Defendant
Giora Bennissim
Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
Safeco Company of Indiana
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Plaintiff
American States Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.
Rivkin Radler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/13 3:28 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/13/2025. (MI)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/13 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice against Defendants BSD OS LLC, Luminex BK LLC, Yitzhak Rahman, Wellspring Solutions LLC, NexGen Line Inc., Giora Bennissim, TM OS LLC, Vital Craft OS LLC, and Mark Benjamin Pelta, request to So-Order stipulation. by American States Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Safeco Company of Indiana, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation (Tiscione, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice against Defendants BSD OS LLC, Luminex BK LLC, Yitzhak Rahman, Wellspring Solutions LLC, NexGen Line Inc., Giora Bennissim, TM OS LLC, Vital Craft OS LLC, and Mark Benjamin Pelta.
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Bober on behalf of American States Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Safeco Company of Indiana, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Bober, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 3:43 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to BSD OS LLC, Giora Bennissim, John Doe Defendants "1" through "10", Luminex BK LLC, NexGen Line Inc., Mark Benjamin Pelta, Yitzhak Rahman, TM OS LLC, Vital Craft OS LLC, Wellspring Solutions LLC. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/07 3:40 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by American States Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Safeco Company of Indiana, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for American States Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Safeco Company of Indiana, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Tiscione, Frank)
Related: [-]
1 1 79 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against BSD OS LLC, Giora Bennissim, John Doe Defendants "1" through "10", Luminex BK LLC, NexGen Line Inc., Mark Benjamin Pelta, Yitzhak Rahman, TM OS LLC, Vital Craft OS LLC, Wellspring Solutions LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18926933 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Safeco Company of Indiana, LM Property and Casualty Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, American States Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation. (Tiscione, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons and Rider,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-Representative sample of BSD OS LLC fraudulent claims,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2-Representative sample of Luminex BK LLC fraudulent claims,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3-Representative sample of Wellspring Solutions LLC fraudulent claims,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4- Representative sample of NexGen Line Inc. fraudulent claims,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5- Representative sample of TM OS LLC fraudulent claims,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6-Representative sample of Vital Craft OS LLC fraudulent claims
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 3:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]