California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-12832
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 12, 2025

Debtor
Westhout MD, Inc.
940 N Western Ave Ste A
San Pedro, CA 90732-2403
Represented By
Michael G Spector
Law Offices Of Michael G. Spector
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Brad D Krasnoff (TR)
2818 La Cienega Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90034
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/07/2025 12:04 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/07 11:44 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-12832] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58256448. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/07 11:25 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Westhout MD, Inc. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/7/2025 (Spector, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/07 11:41 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Krasnoff (TR), Brad D with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/12/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Krasnoff: Meeting ID 782 713 9299, Passcode 1906139725, Phone 1 213 634 7879. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]